This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2019 at 00:06:34 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS WULFF, DAN

Case Summary

On 05/17/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against WULFF, DAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL HALLOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1658

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL HALLOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

WULFF DAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 12C01658 TO LAM12CB1658

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 11:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING IN PRO PER . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketCOURT RULES THAT THE FINAL DECISION OF THE PROCESSING AGENCY IS REVERSED, AND THAT THE PROCESSING AGENCY IS ORDERED TO REFUND TO THE DEPOSITOR ANY PAID PENALTIES AND FILING FEES. MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 11:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING IN PRO PER . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 11:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION TO 09/18/12 AT 10:00A M., IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 11:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION TO 09/18/12 AT 10:00A M., IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 11:50A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING IN PRO PER . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2012
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (WULFF, DAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • DocketREQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE COURT FEES AS TO (WULFF, DAN) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO CIVIL FEE WAIVER CLERK RE: FOLLOW UP ON FEE WAIVER DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketORDER DENYING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES OF (WULFF, DAN) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT HAS TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THE NOTICE OF DENIAL OF WAIVER TO POST THE PROPER FEES WITH THE CLERK`S OFFICE. A REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER HAS BEEN MAILED TO THE APPLICANT. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM FINAL DETERMINATION OF PARKING VIOLATION FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. Filing Fee: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 092 OF HONORABLE CAROL HALLOWITZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION ON 06/19/12 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION FILED AS TO (CITY OF LOS ANGELES) , BY MAIL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (WULFF, DAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less