This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2019 at 05:05:15 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS WATSON, CHERYL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against WATSON, CHERYL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROL HALLOWITZ and PAMELA A. DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2081

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROL HALLOWITZ

Judge

PAMELA A. DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

WATSON CHERYL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 12C02081 TO LAM12CB2081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 11:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING IN PRO PER . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • DocketCOURT RULES THAT THE FINAL DECISION OF THE PROCESSING AGENCY IS REVERSED, AND THAT THE PROCESSING AGENCY IS ORDERED TO REFUND TO THE DEPOSITOR ANY PAID PENALTIES AND FILING FEES. MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 11:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING IN PRO PER . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST LOS ANGELES RE: PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (WATSON, CHERYL) . PARTIAL ONLY: FILING; COPYING; CERTIFICATION; TRANSMITTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketREQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE COURT FEES AS TO (WATSON, CHERYL) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM FINAL DETERMINATION OF PARKING VIOLATION FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. Filing Fee: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 090 OF HONORABLE PAMELA A. DAVIS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION FILED AS TO (CITY OF LOS ANGELES) , BY MAIL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION ON 07/31/12 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (WATSON, CHERYL) .

    Read MoreRead Less