This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 16:13:54 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS WARRINER, DONALD S

Case Summary

On 05/24/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against WARRINER, DONALD S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7944

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

WARRINER DONALD S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant Attorney

WARRINER, DONALD S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2013
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT 616 PARKING APPEAL FEE $25.00 REC #20411006 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 06/14/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT 75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 06/14/12, 00:00 AM, DEPT 75 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • F/W DENIED IN WHOLE. DONALD WARRINER MUST PAY BY 06/13/12 OR PARKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • PARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • APPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • PARKING CITATION NO 1095735115

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF APPEALG PARKING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less