This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2019 at 10:03:45 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS VON ALTHERIMER JR, ALFRED

Case Summary

On 11/01/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against VON ALTHERIMER JR, ALFRED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN BERMAN and CAROL HALLOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3700

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEVEN BERMAN

Judge

CAROL HALLOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

VON ALTHERIMER JR ALFRED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 12C03700 TO LAM12CB3700

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. STEVEN BERMAN, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING (VON ALTHERIMER JR., ALFRED) . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • DocketCOURT RULES THAT THE FINAL DECISION OF THE PROCESSING AGENCY IS AFFIRMED. MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. STEVEN BERMAN, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING (VON ALTHERIMER JR., ALFRED) . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION FILED AS TO (CITY OF LOS ANGELES) , BY MAIL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 092 OF HONORABLE CAROL HALLOWITZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION ON 01/15/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 092 . 2121596223

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (VON ALTHERIMER JR, ALFRED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (VON ALTHERIMER JR, ALFRED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST LOS ANGELES RE: PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM FINAL DETERMINATION OF PARKING VIOLATION FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. Filing Fee: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less