This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2019 at 19:55:39 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS SIEGAL,MARK

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against SIEGAL,MARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN BERMAN, CAROL HALLOWITZ and PAMELA A. DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2717

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAMELA A. DAVIS

Presiding Judges

STEVEN BERMAN

CAROL HALLOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendants

SIEGAL MARK REGISTERED OWNER IN C/O S

SIEGAL MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 12C02717 TO LAM12CB2717

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. STEVEN BERMAN PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING (SIEGAL, MARK) . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketCOURT RULES THAT THE FINAL DECISION OF THE PROCESSING AGENCY IS AFFIRMED. MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. STEVEN BERMAN PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING (SIEGAL, MARK) . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION TO 11/06/12 AT 10:00A M., IN DEPT. 092 . MATTER IS CONTINUED FOR THE APPEARANCE OF SHIRA SIEGAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING IN PRO PER . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION TO 11/06/12 AT 10:00A M., IN DEPT. 092 . MATTER IS CONTINUED FOR THE APPEARANCE OF SHIRA SIEGAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL HALLOWITZ PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING IN PRO PER . RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST LOS ANGELES RE: PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM FINAL DETERMINATION OF PARKING VIOLATION FILED. RN BH457023014. Filing Fee: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION FILED AS TO (CITY OF LOS ANGELES) , BY MAIL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 090 OF HONORABLE PAMELA A. DAVIS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION ON 09/06/12 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 090 . 1101735714

    Read MoreRead Less