This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 05:49:18 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS RUNGE, DALE KEITH

Case Summary

On 01/03/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against RUNGE, DALE KEITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0051

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

RUNGE DALE KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

RUNGE, DALE KEITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2012
  • NOTICE OF DECISION SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY DALE KEITH RUNGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • CIVIL SUBPOENA (EUCES TECUM) FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • EXPARTE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY DALE KEITH RUNGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • MOTION FILED: EX PARTE MOTION HEARING SET FOR 1/18/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • A/C - MOTION FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 03/08/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT 75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF HEARING MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF HEARING DATE NOT MAILED BY THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 01/24/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT 75 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • MATTER SET FOR PARKING APPEAL ON 1/24/2012 IN DEPT.75 @ 8:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • PARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • APPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • PARKING CITATION NO 2101245230

    Read MoreRead Less