This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 18:22:37 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS MAYES, RHYTHM

Case Summary

On 06/25/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against MAYES, RHYTHM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9608

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

MAYES RHYTHM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CITY OF LOS ANGELS

Defendant Attorney

C/O PARKS, ALICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2012
  • THE MATTER IS ADVANCED FROM 7/18/12 AND CALLED FOR HEARING ON 7/17/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE /NOTICE OF APPEAL-PARKING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DECLARATION OF RHYTHM MAYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 07/18/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT 75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • PROCESSING AGENCY OF LA DEPT. OF TRANS. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF APPEAL PARKING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 07/18/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT 75 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • PARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • APPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • PARKING CITATION NO 2117310996

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PARKING APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less