This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2016 at 03:54:33 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS COLE, UNDRE

Case Summary

On 11/15/2013 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against COLE, UNDRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6095

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

COLE UNDRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant Attorney

COLE, UNDRE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2015
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • NOTICE OF DECISION--ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL--REVERSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVE FILE RETURNED TO AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • APPEAL HRG OF 3/6/14 IS RE-SET FROM 1:30 PM TO 8:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 03/06/14, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • NOTICE OF HEARING MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 03/06/14, 01:30 PM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • PARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • APPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • PARKING CITATION # 4212809731

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less