This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 23:29:08 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS BOND, HAILY

Case Summary

On 09/16/2013 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against BOND, HAILY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3161

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

BOND HAILY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant Attorney

BOND, HAILY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2013
  • COMPLAINT VOIDED PURSUANT TO GC 68634(G)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • FEE WAIVER DENIED IN WHOLE. HAILY BOND MUST PAY BY 10/23/13 OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • FEE WAIVER DENIED AS TO HAILY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 10/08/13, 03:00 PM, DEPT 76

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 11/06/13, 01:30 PM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • PARKING APPEAL FILED * * VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • APPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • PARKING CITATION NO 4205396215

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less