This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2022 at 16:10:14 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES OFFICE OF FINANCE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS HENRY M. LEE, LAW CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 CITY OF LOS ANGELES OFFICE OF FINANCE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HENRY M LEE, LAW CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2004

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES OFFICE OF FINANCE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendant

HENRY M. LEE LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/3/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

4/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/24/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

6/12/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearance and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

8/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearance and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/14/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/15/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: City of Los Angeles Office of Finance A Municipal Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by City of Los Angeles Office of Finance A Municipal Corporation on 02/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by City of Los Angeles Office of Finance A Municipal Corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: City of Los Angeles Office of Finance A Municipal Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Los Angeles Office of Finance A Municipal Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 04/05/2021 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Los Angeles Office of Finance A Municipal Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/20/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: City of Los Angeles Office of Finance A Municipal Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY M. LEE, LAW CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION is a litigant