This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2019 at 02:06:02 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES D.O.T VS WILSON, JAMES J.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES D O T filed an Other lawsuit against WILSON, JAMES J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3101

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES D.O.T

Defendant

WILSON JAMES J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CITY OF LOS ANGELES D.O.T

Defendant Attorney

WILSON, JAMES J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketAFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketAFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF DECISION - PARKING APPEAL (AFFIRMED) SIGNED/FILED NOTICE OF DECISION - PARKING APPEAL (AFFIRMED) SIGNED/FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED Matter is called for hearing. Application for waiver of court fees and costs is DENIED. Defendant to pay $ 25.00 filing fee within ten days. Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing is signed and filed this date. A copy of said order is handed to defendant in open court. No further notice required.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED Matter is called for hearing. Application for waiver of court fees and costs is DENIED. Defendant to pay $ 25.00 filing fee within ten days. Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing is signed and filed this date. A copy of said order is handed to defendant in open court. No further notice required.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (DENIED) SIGNED/FILED ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (DENIED) SIGNED/FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Docket*CIVIL DEPOSIT RECEIVED FOR WILSON, JAMES ++ *CIVIL DEPOSIT RECEIVED FOR WILSON, JAMES ++ FRIST PAPER FEE for Parking Appeal filed: Receipt LAV480401044 in the amount of $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SET FOR HEARING) SIGNED/FILED ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SET FOR HEARING) SIGNED/FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • DocketMOTION FILED: FEE WAIVER HEARING HEARING SET FOR 4/25/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER SET FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • DocketHEARING DATE SET FOR 05/17/12, 09:00 AM, DEPT 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketPARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketAPPELLANT/RESPONDENT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF APPEAL - PARKING FILED PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF APPEAL - PARKING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketA/C - FEE WAIVER REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less