This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2019 at 06:51:21 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES D.O.T. VS KWAN, DEANNA

Case Summary

On 01/20/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES D O T filed an Other lawsuit against KWAN, DEANNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0566

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES D.O.T.

Defendant

KWAN DEANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CITY OF LOS ANGELES D.O.T.

DEANNA KWAN

KWAN DEANNA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT FILED BY DEANNA KWAN FOR PARKING APPEAL + CIVIL DEPOSIT FILED BY DEANNA KWAN FOR PARKING APPEAL + AMOUNT PAID: $25.00 RECEIPT #: LAV256837012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED DENIED; INCOME IS TOO HIGH. DEFENDANT GIVEN A COPY OF ORDER IN OPEN COURT. NO FURTHER NOTICE GIVEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED DENIED; INCOME IS TOO HIGH. DEFENDANT GIVEN A COPY OF ORDER IN OPEN COURT. NO FURTHER NOTICE GIVEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • Docket**FEE WAIVER DENIED AFTER HEARING FOR DEANNA KWAN- INCOME IS TOO HIGH **FEE WAIVER DENIED AFTER HEARING FOR DEANNA KWAN- INCOME IS TOO HIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • Docket**FEES DUE ON DENIED FEE WAIVER BY 2/24/12 FOR DEANNA KWAN **FEES DUE ON DENIED FEE WAIVER BY 2/24/12 FOR DEANNA KWAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketMOTION FILED: FEE WAIVER HEARING HEARING SET FOR 2/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DEANNA KWAN REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DEANNA KWAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF APPEAL - PARKING PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF APPEAL - PARKING BY MAIL ON 1/26/12 - CITY OF LOS ANGELES, VAN NUYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • Docket**FEES DUE ON DENIED FEE WAIVER BY 2/09/12 FOR DEANNA KWAN **FEES DUE ON DENIED FEE WAIVER BY 2/09/12 FOR DEANNA KWAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • DocketHEARING DATE SET FOR 03/08/12, 09:00 AM, DEPT 108

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • DocketPARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • DocketAPPELLANT/RESPONDENT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • DocketA/C - FEE WAIVER REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less