This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2017 at 08:17:54 (UTC).

CITY OF LONG BEACH VS ANTONIO DEL REAL

Case Summary

On 01/18/2017 CITY OF LONG BEACH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANTONIO DEL REAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0658

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LONG BEACH

Defendant

DEL REAL ANTONIO AKA ANTONIO L DELREAL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 04/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/19/2017: Minute Order of 04/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/19/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

4/19/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/19/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/18/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Proof of Service - No Service

1/30/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

2/8/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016808 (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016811 (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 04/19/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff City of Long Beach against Defendant Antonio Del Real AKA ANTONIO L DELREAL on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by City of Long Beach on 01/18/2017 for the principal amount of $276.78 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $376.78.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 01/18/2017 to 02/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Del Real (Defendant); Costs: 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Del Real (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: GOVT AGENCY (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: GOVT AGENCY (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Del Real (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less