This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2019 at 01:14:50 (UTC).

CITY OF GLENDALE VS MOGHAVIAN, NAREK

Case Summary

On 10/08/2015 CITY OF GLENDALE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MOGHAVIAN, NAREK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7233

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF GLENDALE

Defendant

MOGHAVIAN NAREK

Assignee

SEQUOIA CONCEPTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA SEQUOIA FINANCIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

SIEGEL EDMOND B.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/8/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/8/2015: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($57.50)

10/29/2015: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($57.50)

Minute Order

12/29/2015: Minute Order

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

12/31/2015: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

12/31/2015: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Rejection

4/13/2017: Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

4/28/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer

5/1/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

5/16/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Order on Request for Court Order

5/16/2017: Order on Request for Court Order

Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

7/17/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 07/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/17/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 07/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Yolanda Rodriguez

7/17/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Yolanda Rodriguez

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/25/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Assignment of Judgment

9/25/2017: Assignment of Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: Sequoia Concepts, Inc., a California Corporation (Assignee); As to: (CITY OF GLENDALE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketHearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 07/17/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (CITY OF GLENDALE) against Defendant (MOGHAVIAN, NAREK) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by (CITY OF GLENDALE) on 10/08/2015 for the principal amount of $1,662.45 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $1,662.45.; Other: Court retained jurisdiction per ccp 664.6. conditional dismissal is vacated. Defendant has failed to comply with settlement agreement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketDismissal entered on 12/29/2015, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Yolanda Rodriguez; Filed by: (CITY OF GLENDALE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 07/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketHearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: (CITY OF GLENDALE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NOTICE OF FEES DUE & PAYABLE UNDER GC 6103.5 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:25A M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. MICHAEL SMALL, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY YOLANDA RODRIGUEZ . DEFENDANT APPEARING . SETTLEMENT REACHED. THE WRITTEN AGREEMENT TO SETTLE CASE IS SIGNED AND FILED WITH CONFORMED COPIES GIVEN TO BOTH PARTIES IN OPEN COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 TO ENFORCE THE FULL TERMS OF SETTLEMENT. .. THE DEFENDANT AGREES TO PAY PLAINTIFF $2,035.50 + $107.50 COSTS IN MONTHLY PAYMENTS OF $100.00 STARTING JAN 5, 2016 & CONTINUING ON THE 5TH OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER UNTIL FULLY PAID (5 DAY GRACE PERIOD). THE PLAINTIFF IS ADMONISHED THAT WAIVED COSTS OF $50.00 ARE PAYABLE DIRECTLY TO THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MOGHAVIAN, NAREK) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/29/15 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 . COSTS OF $ 57.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 6103.5GC. HEARING SET FOR 12/29/15 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (CITY OF GLENDALE) .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.