This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2018 at 07:40:21 (UTC).

CITY OF CARSON VS RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2017 CITY OF CARSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1394

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF CARSON

Carson, CA 90745

Defendant

RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL INC.

357 E. Carson St. #106,

Carson, CA 90745

 

Court Documents

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/27/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/27/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

12/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

12/6/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/5/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/5/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/05/2018

4/5/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/05/2018

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/9/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/15/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

2/15/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/15/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/15/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 04/05/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff City of Carson against Defendant Rainbow International, Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by City of Carson on 11/27/2017 for the principal amount of $148.00 and costs of $40.00 for a total of $188.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/05/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: City of Carson (Plaintiff); As to: Rainbow International, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/09/18; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Carson (Plaintiff); As to: Rainbow International, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/09/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 04/05/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 02/15/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Carson (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Case assigned to in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: City of Carson (Plaintiff); As to: Rainbow International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant