Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2017 at 17:15:35 (UTC).

CITY OF BURBANK VS ANGELA AVETISYAN

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 CITY OF BURBANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGELA AVETISYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3794

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BURBANK

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Defendant

AVETISYAN ANGELA AKA ANGELA AVESTISYAN AKA ANGELA AVETISYAU AKA ANGELA AVETSYAN AKA ANGELA KHAMTRASHYAN AKA ANGELA KHATRSHYAN

Glendale, CA 91205

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/29/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/29/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Steven Aragon

1/24/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Steven Aragon

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

1/24/2017: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 01/24/2017

1/24/2017: Minute Order of 01/24/2017

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/12/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

[Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

1/13/2017: [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/10/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/15/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

11/21/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

11/22/2016: Notice of Postponement

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Steven Aragon; Filed by: CITY OF BURBANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 01/24/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 01/24/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0008059 (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: Court; As to: CITY OF BURBANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: CITY OF BURBANK (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: CITY OF BURBANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA AVETISYAN (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 01/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: CITY OF BURBANK (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AH-2016-0004993 (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CITY OF BURBANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA AVETISYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: CITY OF BURBANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less