This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 15:18:03 (UTC).

CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS VS KOUSHKI, ARAM

Case Summary

On 02/25/2013 CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against KOUSHKI, ARAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0469

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS

Defendant

KOUSHKI ARAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 03:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION#511212225 . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MINUTE ORDER RULING DATED 3/27/13 IS VACATED AND MATTER IS CALENDARED ON 6/26/2013 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPT. 5. 3/27/13 IS ERRONEOUSLY CALENDARED BY THE ENTRY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 03:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION#511212225 . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MINUTE ORDER RULING DATED 3/27/13 IS VACATED AND MATTER IS CALENDARED ON 6/26/2013 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPT. 5. 3/27/13 IS ERRONEOUSLY CALENDARED BY THE ENTRY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 13C00469 TO LAM13CB0469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT NOT APPEARING. RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT NOT APPEARING. RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketCOURT RULES THAT THE FINAL DECISION OF THE PROCESSING AGENCY IS AFFIRMED. MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 005 RE: PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM FINAL DETERMINATION OF PARKING VIOLATION FILED. RN BH451225003. Filing Fee: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION ON 03/27/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . 511212225

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION FILED AS TO (CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS) , BY MAIL .

    Read MoreRead Less