This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2017 at 06:39:28 (UTC).

CITY OF ALHAMBRA VS WALLACE E. ROTH

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 CITY OF ALHAMBRA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WALLACE E ROTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4375

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF ALHAMBRA

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Defendant

ROTH WALLACE E.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/7/2017: Unknown

(Amended)

8/25/2017: (Amended)

by Patricia Fernandez

10/4/2017: by Patricia Fernandez

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/04/2017

10/4/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/04/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

10/4/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/11/2017: Unknown

(Amended)

8/25/2017: (Amended)

by Patricia Fernandez

8/25/2017: by Patricia Fernandez

Patricia Fernandez

8/14/2017: Patricia Fernandez

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017

8/14/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/14/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Patricia Fernandez

6/7/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Patricia Fernandez

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: City Of Alhambra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Updated -- Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department NE2 to Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 12/15/2017 08:30 AM at 12/15/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Patricia Fernandez; Filed by: City Of Alhambra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 10/04/2017 08:30 AM at 10/04/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: City Of Alhambra (Plaintiff); As to: Wallace E. Roth (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: City Of Alhambra (Plaintiff); As to: Wallace E. Roth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0013535 (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Patricia Fernandez; Filed by: City Of Alhambra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less