Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 16:25:46 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS MCKNIGHT, LAVON D

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCKNIGHT, LAVON D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6701

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK N.A.

CITIBANK N. A.

Defendant

MCKNIGHT LAVON D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT AND HENRIQUES - MICHAEL S HUNT ESQ

Attorney at HUNT AND HENRIQUES

HUNT MICHAEL S ESQ

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

5/25/2018: Writ - Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution: Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles; Principal: 7,091.79; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (CITIBANK) N.A. , RECEIPT NO. NOR481437043 . SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. SASE . RECEIPT # NOR244539012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/23/17 . FOR (CITIBANK) N.A. . AGAINST (MCKNIGHT, LAVON D) . PRINCIPAL $ 6807.29 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 284.50 . TOTAL $ 7,091.79 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: 1. INTEREST 2. COSTS (CCP 1033) 3. ATTORNEY FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MCKNIGHT, LAVON D) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (MCKNIGHT, LAVON D) ON 4/26/2017 . COSTS OF $ 59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/13/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371004. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S