This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2019 at 02:15:15 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS MARIO L SUAREZ

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIO L SUAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7181

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

SUAREZ MARIO L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN DEVIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/23/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • Hearing12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Mario L Suarez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/20/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Mario L Suarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Mario L Suarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Mario L Suarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.