Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 04:33:34 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS MARIAN P VALES

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIAN P VALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7200

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

VALES MARIAN P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN DEVIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

7/14/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Default Judgment - Default Judgment Clerk

7/14/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment Clerk

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

9/28/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marian P Vales (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 6383.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment Clerk; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marian P Vales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marian P Vales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Marian P Vales; On the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff CITIBANK N.A. against Defendant Marian P Vales on the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on 12/05/2019 for the principal amount of $6,093.34 and costs of $290.00 for a total of $6,383.34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/20/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marian P Vales (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marian P Vales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marian P Vales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marian P Vales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSEN, DEVIN