Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2021 at 09:35:25 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS JESUS F SERMENO

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESUS F SERMENO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0875

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

SERMENO JESUS F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN CARINA MARIE

Defendant Attorney

MERRITT TYNEIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: Jesus F Sermeno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus F Sermeno (Defendant); Service Date: 09/03/2020; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus F Sermeno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus F Sermeno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus F Sermeno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERRITT TYNEIA GENE