Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 00:12:46 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS IVONNE M TOMALA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IVONNE M TOMALA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7169

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

TOMALA IVONNE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN DEVIN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/31/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on 12/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CITIBANK N.A. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/20/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Ivonne M Tomala (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Ivonne M Tomala (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Ivonne M Tomala (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less