Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 07:54:26 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS HEIDI BENHAMOU COURTNEY

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HEIDI BENHAMOU COURTNEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1377

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

COURTNEY HEIDI BENHAMOU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS EMILY

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/10/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

9/18/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

9/18/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Heidi Benhamou Courtney (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Heidi Benhamou Courtney (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Heidi Benhamou Courtney; On the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff CITIBANK N.A. against Defendant Heidi Benhamou Courtney on the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on 03/18/2020 for the principal amount of $2,436.71 and costs of $290.00 for a total of $2,726.71.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Heidi Benhamou Courtney (Defendant); Service Date: 06/26/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Heidi Benhamou Courtney (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Heidi Benhamou Courtney (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Heidi Benhamou Courtney (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS EMILY