Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2021 at 13:45:24 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS FRANCISCO ROMERO

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANCISCO ROMERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0818

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

ROMERO FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

APPS STANLEY

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

10/27/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/31/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Francisco Romero (Defendant); As to: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Romero (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/16/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Romero (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/16/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW - ANTHONY DIPIERO