Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2020 at 09:08:43 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS EDUARDO LLUNCOR

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDUARDO LLUNCOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0821

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

LLUNCOR EDUARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIDD ADAM LEIGH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/31/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CITIBANK, N.A. on 08/31/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by CITIBANK, N.A. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Lluncor (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/06/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Lluncor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Lluncor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Lluncor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less