Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 10:41:25 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS DIDIER A GARCIA

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIDIER A GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0827

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

GARCIA DIDIER A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIDD ADAM LEIGH

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

12/2/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

10/26/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/26/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

10/26/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/31/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Didier A Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Didier A Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Didier A Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Didier A Garcia; On the Complaint filed by CITIBANK, N.A. on 08/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff CITIBANK, N.A. against Defendant Didier A Garcia on the Complaint filed by CITIBANK, N.A. on 08/31/2020 for the principal amount of $4,406.55 and costs of $290.00 for a total of $4,696.55.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Didier A Garcia (Defendant); Service Date: 09/04/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Didier A Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Didier A Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Didier A Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIDD ADAM LEIGH