Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 16:30:15 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS CARLOS MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARLOS MENDOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9370

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

MENDOZA CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/5/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

10/27/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/27/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

10/28/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/6/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/31/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Carlos Mendoza (Defendant) to Carlos Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 01/06/2021 ; Status Date changed from 10/28/2020 to 01/06/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff CITIBANK N.A. against Defendant Carlos Mendoza on the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on 08/31/2020 for the principal amount of $6,539.00 and costs of $290.00 for a total of $6,829.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Carlos Mendoza; On the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on 08/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Defendant); Service Date: 09/05/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW - ANTHONY DIPIERO