Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2020 at 10:20:49 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS BERT J RANDEEN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BERT J RANDEEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7201

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

RANDEEN BERT J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN DEVIN

Defendant Attorney

APPS STANLEY

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

7/8/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Order (name extension) - Order ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6

7/8/2020: Order (name extension) - Order ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6

Answer - Answer

1/10/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6: Filed By: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on 12/05/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Bert J Randeen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Bert J Randeen (Defendant); As to: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Bert J Randeen (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Bert J Randeen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Bert J Randeen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Bert J Randeen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less