Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/31/2020 at 08:53:59 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS ARMINEH A BEZDIKIAN

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARMINEH A BEZDIKIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9362

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

BEZDIKIAN ARMINEH A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ISOZAKI RYOTA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/31/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Armineh A Bezdikian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Armineh A Bezdikian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Armineh A Bezdikian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less