This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2017 at 13:28:55 (UTC).

CIRI ELLIS VS ROBERT AMBROSE

Case Summary

On 07/08/2016 CIRI ELLIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERT AMBROSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1056

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELLIS CIRI

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Defendant

AMBROSE ROBERT

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - ( notice of entry of judgment )

3/6/2017: RETURNED MAIL - ( notice of entry of judgment )

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/11/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/8/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/7/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/7/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 02/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/7/2017: Minute Order of 02/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/9/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 09/09/2016

9/9/2016: Minute Order of 09/09/2016

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

[Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

9/13/2017: [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/7/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 12/07/2016

12/7/2016: Minute Order of 12/07/2016

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Ciri Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Robert Ambrose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/13/2017 ; Status Date changed from 02/07/2017 to 09/13/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/13/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/13/2017 to 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/13/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/13/2017 to 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL ( notice of entry of judgment ); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ciri Ellis (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Ambrose (Defendant); Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/09/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 RES to 12/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ciri Ellis (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Ambrose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0001581 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.