This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 17:27:43 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200 LLC VS WENYI YAN

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 CIRCA 1200 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WENYI YAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0705

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

YAN WENYI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINRAD FREDERICK L

 

Court Documents

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

2/19/2020: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/19/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Writ of Execution - Writ of Possession

2/19/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Possession

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/23/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Wenyi Yan)

1/23/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Wenyi Yan)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/21/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/21/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/21/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

6/23/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession: Filed By: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 06/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPremise address is amended to 1200 S. Figueroa St., East Tower, Apt. 1213, Los Angeles, CA 90015.; Default judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Circa 1200 LLC against Defendant Wenyi Yan on the Complaint filed by Circa 1200 LLC on 01/21/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1200 S. Figueroa St., East Tower, Apt. 1213, Los Angeles, CA 90015 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wenyi Yan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wenyi Yan (Defendant); Service Date: 01/29/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 01/29/2020; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Wenyi Yan; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Circa 1200 LLC on 01/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Wenyi Yan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wenyi Yan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wenyi Yan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Circa 1200 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wenyi Yan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPINRAD FREDERICK LYNN