This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 12:41:09 (UTC).

CINTHIA VASQUEZ RODRIGUEZ VS CRISTIAN SANDOVAL

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 CINTHIA VASQUEZ RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRISTIAN SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3072

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ CINTHIA VASQUEZ

Defendants

SANDOVAL CRISTIAN

VALESQUEZ ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNETT CASE CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

DUFFY JOHN

 

Court Documents

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Defendant's Form Interrogatories, Set One

8/8/2019: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Defendant's Form Interrogatories, Set One

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Demand for Inspection of Documents, Set One

8/8/2019: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Demand for Inspection of Documents, Set One

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/12/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Answer - Answer

4/26/2019: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

4/26/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - on Complaint

10/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/13/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 10/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 10/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Defendant's Form Interrogatories, Set One; Filed by: Cristian Sandoval (Defendant); Roberto Valesquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Demand for Inspection of Documents, Set One; Filed by: Cristian Sandoval (Defendant); Roberto Valesquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Cristian Sandoval (Defendant); Roberto Valesquez (Defendant); As to: Cinthia Vasquez Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Cristian Sandoval (Defendant); Roberto Valesquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 12/16/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cinthia Vasquez Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Cristian Sandoval (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cinthia Vasquez Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC03072    Hearing Date: January 09, 2020    Dept: 94

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Cristian Sandoval and Roberto Valesquez’s (1) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Cinthia Vasquez Rodriguez To Respond to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Cinthia Vasquez Rodriguez to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions are GRANTED.

PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $490.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

SUMMARY OF COMPLAINT: Action for motor vehicle negligence.

GROUNDS FOR MOTION: The Court should compel Plaintiff to provide verified responses to the interrogatories and document demands, without objections. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290; 2031.300.) Also, the Court should sanction Plaintiff for failing to serve responses to said discovery. Sanctions are sought in the amount of $1,210.38 per motion. [Counsel charges $185.00 per hour].

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Cinthia Vasquez Rodriguez (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendants Cristian Sandoval and Roberto Valesquez (“Defendants”) on October 13, 2017. On April 30, 2019, Defendants served Form Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents on Plaintiff. (Motions, Rush Decl. ¶6 and Exh. A.)  To date, Defendant has not received any verified responses to the propounded discovery requests from Plaintiff.  (Id. at ¶¶10-11.)

Due to the failure to respond to the propounded discovery requests, Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, to Defendants’ Form Interrogatories and Request for Production within twenty (20) days from the date of Defendant serving a notice of this Order. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290; 2031.300.) Monetary sanctions are also awarded under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Given the simplicity of the Motions and the lack of opposition and reply, the Court finds that sanctions are appropriate in the amount of $490.00 based on two hours of attorney time billed at $185.00 per hour, plus two filing fees of $60.00 each. (Motions, Rush Decl., ¶12.) Sanctions are to be paid within thirty (30) days from the date of Defendants serving notice of this Order.

Defendants Cristian Sandoval and Roberto Valesquez’s (1) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Cinthia Vasquez Rodriguez To Respond to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Cinthia Vasquez Rodriguez to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions, are GRANTED.

Moving party to give notice.