Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 03:11:54 (UTC).

CHUANXUE YIN VS FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 CHUANXUE YIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0212

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YIN CHUANXUE

Defendant

FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/15/2019

2/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/15/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/25/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/15/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/17/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/9/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 02/15/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Chuanxue Yin on 01/09/2019 as follows: Defendant Fenwu University Of Alternative Medicine L.P. does not owe the plaintiff Chuanxue Yin any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/15/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Chuanxue Yin (Plaintiff); As to: Fenwu University Of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/14/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Chuanxue Yin (Plaintiff); As to: Fenwu University Of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P. DBA ALHAMBRA MEDICAL UNIVERSITY is a litigant