This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2020 at 15:40:51 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER MCGEE VS SAHAR SHARIFI

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 CHRISTOPHER MCGEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAHAR SHARIFI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7969

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCGEE CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

SHARIFI SAHAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATANIAN NAVID A.

Defendant Attorney

BAHARVAR GABRIELLA

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/20/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearings)

5/20/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearings)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearings) of 05/20/2020

5/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearings) of 05/20/2020

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/20/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Answer - Answer

11/6/2019: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

11/6/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/6/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

8/28/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/28/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/28/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • Hearing08/31/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Hearing02/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 06/23/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 06/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 06/23/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 06/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Sahar Sharifi (Defendant); As to: Christopher McGee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Sahar Sharifi (Defendant); As to: Christopher McGee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 06/23/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 06/23/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearings) of 05/20/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Sahar Sharifi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Sahar Sharifi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christopher McGee (Plaintiff); As to: Sahar Sharifi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christopher McGee (Plaintiff); As to: Sahar Sharifi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christopher McGee (Plaintiff); As to: Sahar Sharifi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC07969    Hearing Date: June 23, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Sahar Sharifi’s (1) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Form and Special Interrogatories is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to provide verified responses to Form and Special Interrogatories without objections within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

However, Defendant’s (2) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Request for Production of Documents is CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 3, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE to allow Defendant the opportunity to pay one additional filing fee.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of June 17, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of June 17, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On August 28, 2019, Plaintiff Christopher McGee (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for negligence against Defendant Sahar Sharifi (“Defendant”). On November 6, 2019, Defendant filed an Answer.

On May 20, 2020, Defendant filed the instant (1) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Form and Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions (the “Interrogatories Motion”), and (2) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and Request for Sanctions (the “Production Motion”) (collectively, the “Motions”).

To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

A. Improper Combination of Discovery Motions

As an initial matter, the Court notes that Defendant impermissibly attempts to combine multiple requests for relief. Specifically, Defendant moves to compel Plaintiff’s responses to Form Interrogatories and Special Interrogatories in a single motion. However, filing as a single motion negatively impacts the Court’s calendar by placing more motions on the calendar than slots have been allotted by the online reservation system. In addition, combining discovery motions allows the moving party to avoid paying the requisite filing fees. Statutorily required filing fees are jurisdictional and “it is mandatory for the court clerks to demand and receive statutorily required filing fees.” (See Duran v. St. Luke’s Hospital (2003) 114 Cal.App.4th 457, 460.) Here, Defendant has only paid one filing fee for what should have been two separate interrogatories motions.

Accordingly, Defendant is ordered to pay one additional filing fee. The Court will rule on the Interrogatories Motion, but the Production Motion will be continued pending payment of one additional filing fee.

B. Form and Special Interrogatories

A party must respond to interrogatories within 30 days after service. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.260, subd. (a).) If a party to whom interrogatories are directed does not provide timely responses, the requesting party may move for an order compelling responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (b).) The party also waives the right to make any objections, including one based on privilege or work-product protection. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (a).) There is no time limit for a motion to compel responses to interrogatories other than the cut-off on hearing discovery motions 15 days before trial. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2024.020, subd. (a); Code Civ. Proc., 2030.290.) No meet and confer efforts are required before filing a motion to compel responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290; Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 411.)

Here, Defendant served Plaintiff with Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Special Interrogatories, Set One, on November 5, 2019 by regular mail. (Mot., Baharvar Decl., ¶ 4, Exh. A.) Although not statutorily required, on December 26, 2019, Defendant’s Counsel sent Plaintiff’s counsel a letter regarding the lack of discovery responses. (Id. at ¶ 5, Exh. B.) In addition, on January 17, 2020, Defendant’s counsel granted Plaintiff a 45-day extension to provide responses. (Id. at ¶ 6.) To date, Defendant has not received any responses to the discovery requests. (Id. at ¶ 7.) Thus, Defendant is entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff to provide verified responses to Form Interrogatories and Special Interrogatories without objections. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290; 2031.300.)

C. Sanctions

The Court will address Defendant’s request for sanctions at the next scheduled hearing.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Sahar Sharifi’s (1) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Form and Special Interrogatories is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to provide verified responses to Form and Special Interrogatories without objections within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

However, Defendant’s (2) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Request for Production of Documents is CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 3, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE to allow Defendant the opportunity to pay one additional filing fee.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.