This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 10:54:35 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER MARTINEZ VS TOKIO LOS ANGELES LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 CHRISTOPHER MARTINEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TOKIO LOS ANGELES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES E. BLANCARTE and COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2278

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

TOKIO LOS ANGELES LLC

UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC.

BITAR DANY FOUAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

15720 Ventura Blvd. Suite 228

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorneys

CUZZOLINA J.D.

ROSENBERGER ELLIOT ALBERT

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment Proposed

8/3/2021: Judgment - Judgment Proposed

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

8/11/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of 07/28/2021

7/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of 07/28/2021

Order (name extension) - Order Re: Court Trial

6/15/2021: Order (name extension) - Order Re: Court Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/15/2021, Order Re: Court Trial

6/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/15/2021, Order Re: Court Trial

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice (name extension) - Notice to Attend Trial

1/6/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice to Attend Trial

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/7/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

4/27/2021: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))

1/5/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))

Answer - Answer

7/10/2019: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/12/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/19/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/17/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Complaint - Complaint

3/6/2019: Complaint - Complaint

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Alhambra Courthouse in Department 3 - Hon. Colin P. Leis; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Tokio Los Angeles LLC (Defendant); Dany Fouad Bitar (Defendant); Costs: 652.00; Interest: 106.91; Service Date: 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketJudgment Proposed; Signed and Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Tokio Los Angeles LLC (Defendant); Dany Fouad Bitar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Attorney Fees: Filed By: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of 07/28/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for 07/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE3 updated: Result Date to 07/28/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for 07/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE3

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Tokio Los Angeles LLC (Defendant); Underrated Presents, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Tokio Los Angeles LLC (Defendant); Underrated Presents, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Tokio Los Angeles LLC (Defendant); Underrated Presents, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC02278    Hearing Date: January 05, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Tue., January 5, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Martinez v. Tokio Los Angeles, et al. COMP. FILED: 03-06-19

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC02278 DISC. C/O: 05-03-21

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 05-18-21

TRIAL DATE: 06-02-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 473

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Dany Bitar

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Dany Bitar’s Motion to Set Aside Default Pursuant to CCP section 473 is GRANTED. The default entered against Defendant Dany Bitar on May 19, 2020 is HEREBY VACATED.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of December 31, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of December 31, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On March 6, 2019, Plaintiff Christopher Martinez (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for violation of the Unruh Civil Rights Act against Defendants Tokio Los Angeles, LLC (“Tokio”) and Underrated Presents, Inc. (“Underrated”). Dany Bitar (“Bitar”) filed a general denial on behalf of Defendant Tokio on June 21, 2019. Defendant Underrated filed an Answer on July 10, 2019 but was dismissed from the action on July 12, 2019.

Plaintiff substituted Defendant Bitar for Doe 1 on November 6, 2019. Defendant Bitar was personally served with the Summons and Complaint on April 15, 2019. (5/19/20 Proof of Service.) Following Defendant Bitar’s failure to respond, a default was entered against him on May 19, 2020. No judgment has yet been entered.

On July 17, 2020, Defendant Bitar filed the instant Motion to Set Aside Default Pursuant to CCP section 473 (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

Defendant Bitar seeks relief pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (b). (Mot., pp. 1:27-2:19.) Under this statute, an application for relief must be made no more than six months after entry of the judgment, dismissal, order or other proceeding from which relief is sought and must be accompanied by an affidavit of fault attesting to the mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect of the moving party or its attorney. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b); English v. IKON Business Solutions (2001) 94 Cal.App.4th 130, 143.)

Defendant Bitar’s Motion is timely. He seeks to set aside the May 19, 2020 default based on his mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect. (Mot., p 1:6-8.) Specifically, Defendant states that he mistakenly believed that the general denial he filed on behalf of Defendant Tokio was enough to protect his rights in this matter. (Mot., Bitar Decl., ¶ 4.) He also explains that although he acted diligently in seeking an attorney after being personally served, he had difficulty finding affordable legal representation and believed he had more time to retain an attorney. (Id. at ¶¶ 6-8.) Well-established law favors resolving cases on the merits and any doubts will be resolved in favor of the party seeking relief from default. (Fayusi v. Permatex, Inc. (2008) 167 Cal.App.4th 681, 696.)

Based on the timely request to vacate the dismissal supported by Defendant Bitar’s declaration attesting to his mistake, the unopposed Motion is GRANTED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Dany Bitar’s Motion to Set Aside Default Pursuant to CCP section 473 is GRANTED. The default entered against Defendant Dan Bitar on May 19, 2020 is HEREBY VACATED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOKIO LOS ANGELES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUZZOLINA J.D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERGER ELLIOT ALBERT