This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 00:25:57 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER MARTINEZ VS STEVEN EDELSON

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 CHRISTOPHER MARTINEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STEVEN EDELSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7236

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

EDELSON STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorney

SMITH CRAIG

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/6/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Release of Judgment Lien

11/3/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Release of Judgment Lien

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT ; ORDER

11/24/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT ; ORDER

Answer - Answer

12/24/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice (name extension) - Notice to Attend Trial

12/29/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice to Attend Trial

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/19/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Response (name extension) - Response TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES DECLARATION OF CRAIG R SMITH

4/14/2021: Response (name extension) - Response TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES DECLARATION OF CRAIG R SMITH

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

4/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

4/16/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/22/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/22/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service, by Sheriff's Department

9/13/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service, by Sheriff's Department

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/30/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/31/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/31/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/31/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/6/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • Hearing10/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Edelson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 04/15/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketResponse TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES DECLARATION OF CRAIG R SMITH; Filed by: Steven Edelson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Edelson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice to Attend Trial; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Edelson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Steven Edelson (Defendant); As to: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER; Filed by: Steven Edelson (Defendant); As to: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Edelson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Edelson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christopher Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Edelson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC07236    Hearing Date: April 15, 2021    Dept: 26

Martinez v. Edelson, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Christopher Martinez’s Motion for Order Compelling Defendant Steven Edelson to Respond To Form Interrogatories and Request For Sanctions is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE DISCOVERY REQUESTS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS THAT DEFENDANT AND COUNSEL OF RECORD JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY PAY SANCTIONS OF $237.50 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On December 29, 2020, Plaintiff Christopher Martinez (“Plaintiff”) served Form Interrogatories on Defendant Steven Edelson. (Motion, Mehrban Decl., Exh. A.) Plaintiff has not received any verified responses to the form interrogatories from Defendant to date. (Id. at ¶4.) There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Due to Defendant’s failure to respond to the written discovery, the Motion is GRANTED as to Form Interrogatories, Set One.

Defendant’s failure to timely respond constitutes a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030 and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive under a lodestar calculation. The request for sanctions is granted against Defendant and counsel of record in the amount of $237.50 based on half an hour of attorney time billed at $475.00 an hour. (Motion, Mehrban Decl., ¶5.)

Conclusion

Plaintiff Christopher Martinez’s Motion for Order Compelling Defendant Steven Edelson to Respond To Form Interrogatories and Request For Sanctions is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE DISCOVERY REQUESTS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS THAT DEFENDANT AND COUNSEL OF RECORD JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY PAY SANCTIONS OF $237.50 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH CRAIG