This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 10:22:00 (UTC).

CHRISTINE NI VS DELIA JOSE LARA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 CHRISTINE NI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DELIA JOSE LARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7795

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NI CHRISTINE

Defendant

LARA DELIA JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WISEMAN ALFRED JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

2/18/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

2/18/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 02/18/2021

2/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 02/18/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CHRISTINE NI on 08/22/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(c)(3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 02/18/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 02/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/25/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: CHRISTINE NI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: CHRISTINE NI (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/22/2019; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CHRISTINE NI (Plaintiff); As to: DELIA JOSE LARA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: CHRISTINE NI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CHRISTINE NI (Plaintiff); As to: DELIA JOSE LARA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CHRISTINE NI (Plaintiff); As to: DELIA JOSE LARA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less