Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2021 at 06:03:01 (UTC).

CHRISTINA HERNANDEZ VS WILBERT A. GUARDADO

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 CHRISTINA HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILBERT A GUARDADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0687

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ CRISTINA

Defendant

GUARDADO WILBERT A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYU FRANCIS

Defendant Attorney

HAMBARCHYAN ARIN

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Defendant Wilbert A. Guardado's notice of motion and motion to compel plaintiff Cristina Hernandez to respond to inspection demands

4/5/2021: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Defendant Wilbert A. Guardado's notice of motion and motion to compel plaintiff Cristina Hernandez to respond to inspection demands

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Defendant Wilbert A. Guardado's notice of motion and motion to compel plaintiff Cristina Hernandez's verified responses to defendant's form interro

4/5/2021: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Defendant Wilbert A. Guardado's notice of motion and motion to compel plaintiff Cristina Hernandez's verified responses to defendant's form interro

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Defendant Wilbert A. Guardado's notice of motion and motion to compel plaintiff Cristina Hernandez's verified responses to defendant's special inte

4/5/2021: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Defendant Wilbert A. Guardado's notice of motion and motion to compel plaintiff Cristina Hernandez's verified responses to defendant's special inte

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

5/13/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/14/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Answer - Answer

1/23/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/9/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • Hearing08/31/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/31/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Wilbert A. Guardado (Defendant); As to: Cristina Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cristina Hernandez (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 104.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cristina Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Wilbert A. Guardado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cristina Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Wilbert A. Guardado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cristina Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Wilbert A. Guardado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC10687    Hearing Date: May 4, 2021    Dept: 26

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION;

REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2031.300, 2023.010)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Wilbert A. Guardado’s Motion To Compel Responses To Request For Production Of Documents and Request for Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

Trial in this action is set for May 18, 2021. The corresponding cutoffs for discovery and discovery motions are April 18, 2020 and May 3, 2020, respectively. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2024.020, subd. (a).) The instant Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents and Request for Sanctions is set to be heard after the statutory cutoff for discovery motions.

The Court cannot grant discovery motions after the cut-off date unless the moving party has moved under Code of Civil Procedure section 2024.050 to have the motions heard closer to the trial date. (Pelton-Shepherd Industries, Inc. v. Delta Packaging Products, Inc. (2008) 165 Cal.App.4th 1568, 1586-1587.) The Court’s discretion in allowing the motions to be heard closer to the trial date than allowed by Code of Civil Procedure section 2024.020 is bound by the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure section 2024.050, which include submission of a meet and confer declaration and the trial court’s consideration of the statutory factors. (Ibid.)

Conclusion

Therefore, Defendant Wilbert A. Guardado’s Motion To Compel Responses To Request For Production Of Documents and Request for Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYU FRANCIS