This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 14:06:15 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN WRIGHT VS ELEMENTS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH

Case Summary

On 10/31/2016 CHRISTIAN WRIGHT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELEMENTS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4430

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRIGHT CHRISTIAN

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Defendant

ELEMENTS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH

5000 E. Sprine St., Ste 650

Long Beach, CA 90815

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - (minute order of 12/28/2016)

1/9/2017: RETURNED MAIL - (minute order of 12/28/2016)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

12/28/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Other - (name extension) - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

12/28/2016: Other - (name extension) - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/23/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/28/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 12/28/2016

12/28/2016: Minute Order of 12/28/2016

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/31/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL (minute order of 12/28/2016); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 12/28/2016; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Other - Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Christian Wright (Plaintiff); Elements Behavioral Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 12/28/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Christian Wright (Plaintiff); As to: Elements Behavioral Health (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/06/2016; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Christian Wright (Plaintiff); As to: Elements Behavioral Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0005818 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Elements Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant