Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 07:28:21 (UTC).

CHRIS PAUL VS EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 CHRIS PAUL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5298

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAUL CHRIS

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Defendant

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT LLC

1748 N. Fuller Ave.

Los Angeles, CA 90046

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

9/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

12/13/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

12/13/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

12/13/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

12/14/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

12/14/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

2/26/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

3/9/2018: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/12/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

7/17/2018: Notice of Postponement

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/29/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

2/8/2019: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

2/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

9/8/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/7/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 217.16; Interest Credits: 36.90; Principal Credits: 950.94; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 03/12/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from Equity Residential Management, LLC (Defendant) to Equity Residential Management, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from Equity Residential Management, LLC (Defendant) to Equity Residential Management, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from Equity Residential Management, LLC (Defendant) to Equity Residential Management, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Chris Paul against Defendant Equity Residential Management, LLC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Chris Paul on 07/19/2017 for the principal amount of $8,900.00 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $8,900.00, joint and several.; Other: Default judgment.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $75.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Equity Residential Management, LLC. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment amended on 09/07/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/08/2017 to 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Chris Paul (Plaintiff); As to: Equity Residential Management, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/20/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service Faulty: Parties name does not match: Name Extension: Faulty: Parties name does not match

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Chris Paul (Plaintiff); As to: Equity Residential Management, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Chris Paul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0015442 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Residential Management LLC is a litigant