Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 19:57:12 (UTC).

CHERRY LEE VS HUAIQING ZHANG

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 CHERRY LEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUAIQING ZHANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2485

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE CHERRY

Defendant

ZHANG HUAIQING

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/05/2021

1/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/05/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/28/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/28/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim an

10/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim an

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Cherry Lee on 10/28/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/05/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/05/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cherry Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Huaiqing Zhang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Cherry Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cherry Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Cherry Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less