This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2020 at 17:15:33 (UTC).

CHENG, JESSIE VS FRESCURA, JOHN

Case Summary

On 07/30/2012 CHENG, JESSIE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FRESCURA, JOHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0720

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHENG JESSIE

Defendant

FRESCURA JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FIERSTADT, EDWARD T

FIERSTADT EDWARD T

Defendant Attorney

FRESCURA, JOHN ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2012
  • DocketRETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY SATISFIED AS TO POSSESSION ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/07/12, 01:30 PM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketA/C - ANSWER FILING REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketA/C - FEE WAIVER REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less