Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2019 at 14:47:14 (UTC).

CHEHRAZI, DARREN VS ESPEJEL, LUIS

Case Summary

On 06/18/2012 CHEHRAZI, DARREN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESPEJEL, LUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0560

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEHRAZI DARREN

Defendants

ESPEJEL LUIS

ESPEJEL MARISELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEAR, SHERRY ANNE

LEAR SHERRY ANNE

Defendant Attorneys

ESPEJEL, LUIS

ESPEJEL, MARISELA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2013
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT WHOLLY RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT WHOLLY UNSATISFIED AS TO POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • SOUTH DISTRICT-SAN PEDRO COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • COMMISSIONER, Presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • applied to the court for judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • DEPT. 88 PAGE 001 OF 001 PAGES DATE OF PROCEEDINGS: 07/19/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • TRIAL MINUTES SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • In Dept. 88, Honorable DOUGLAS HAIGH,

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-10 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less