This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 10:43:51 (UTC).

CHARLOTTE BIRNBAUM VS RELIANCE HOME SERVICES/ADEEDO

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 CHARLOTTE BIRNBAUM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RELIANCE HOME SERVICES/ADEEDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0669

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIRNBAUM CHARLOTTE

Defendant

RELIANCE HOME SERVICES/ADEEDO

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/15/2020

9/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/15/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

8/12/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

8/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

7/29/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

7/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Attachment - Attachment

7/23/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/19/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

5/11/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/25/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/25/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

2/25/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/25/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by charlotte birnbaum on 02/25/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/15/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 09/15/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: charlotte birnbaum (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: charlotte birnbaum (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/17/2020 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/17/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: charlotte birnbaum (Plaintiff); As to: Reliance Home Services/Adeedo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RELIANCE HOME SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant