This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 01:04:11 (UTC).

CHARLES O BRACKEN VS ARACELI PRADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 CHARLES O BRACKEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARACELI PRADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1700

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRACKEN CHARLES O.

Defendants

PRADO JUAN JOSE

RODRIGUEZ JR. ENRIQUE

PRADO ARACELI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINE ROBERT ALAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

10/7/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 10/07/2021

10/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 10/07/2021

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

10/7/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/30/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

7/29/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/20/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

2/20/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CHARLES O. BRACKEN on 02/20/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 10/07/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/07/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/07/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10/07/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CHARLES O. BRACKEN (Plaintiff); As to: ARACELI PRADO (Defendant); JUAN JOSE PRADO (Defendant); Enrique Rodriguez, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CHARLES O. BRACKEN (Plaintiff); As to: ARACELI PRADO (Defendant); JUAN JOSE PRADO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CHARLES O. BRACKEN (Plaintiff); As to: ARACELI PRADO (Defendant); JUAN JOSE PRADO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINE ROBERT ALAN