This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 22:53:33 (UTC).

CHANG, SAM K. VS PATTERSON, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 01/24/2013 CHANG, SAM K filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PATTERSON, ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0081

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANG SAM K.

Defendant

PATTERSON ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHANG, MITCHELL ESQ.

CHANG MITCHELL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PATTERSON, ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT $60.00 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • MOTION FILED: EX PARTE MOTION HEARING SET FOR 4/18/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED CASE CALLED AT APPROXIMATELY 10:15 A.M. PLAINTIFF NOT IN COURT. DEFENDANT IS PRESENT WITH HIS MOTHER. APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT IS REVIEWED AND CONSIDERED IN OPEN COURT. DEFENDANT'S MOTHER ADVISED THE COURT THAT SHE HAD INADVERTENTLY GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF IN OPEN COURT A $291. CHECK ON A CLOSED ACCOUNT AND THAT SHE SENT A REPLACEMENT MONEY ORDER TO PLAINTIFF WHICH PLAINTIFF RETURNED TO HER. UPON THE COURT'S INQUIRY, DEFENDANT ADVISED THAT SHE RETAINED POSSESSION OF SAID CHECK BUT DID NOT HAVE IT WITH HER IN COURT. COURT RECESSED PROCEEDINGS UNTIL 1:30 P.M., AND ADVISED DEFENDANT THAT, IN RULING ON THE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, THAT THE COURT WOULD CONSIDER WHETHER DEFENDANT RETURNED AT 1:30 P.M. WITH THE REPLACEMENT MONEY ORDER. CAUSE CALLED AT 2:10 P.M. NO APPEARANCES MADE. COURT RECESSED AFTER AFTERNOON SESSION CONCLUDED AT APPROXIMATELY 3:45 P.M. RULING: APPLICATION IS DENIED. THE COURT EXPRESSES ITS APPRECIATION TO THE DEFENDANT AND HIS MOTHER FOR THEIR COURTESY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED CASE CALLED AT APPROXIMATELY 10:15 A.M. PLAINTIFF NOT IN COURT. DEFENDANT IS PRESENT WITH HIS MOTHER. APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT IS REVIEWED AND CONSIDERED IN OPEN COURT. DEFENDANT'S MOTHER ADVISED THE COURT THAT SHE HAD INADVERTENTLY GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF IN OPEN COURT A $291. CHECK ON A CLOSED ACCOUNT AND THAT SHE SENT A REPLACEMENT MONEY ORDER TO PLAINTIFF WHICH PLAINTIFF RETURNED TO HER. UPON THE COURT'S INQUIRY, DEFENDANT ADVISED THAT SHE RETAINED POSSESSION OF SAID CHECK BUT DID NOT HAVE IT WITH HER IN COURT. COURT RECESSED PROCEEDINGS UNTIL 1:30 P.M., AND ADVISED DEFENDANT THAT, IN RULING ON THE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, THAT THE COURT WOULD CONSIDER WHETHER DEFENDANT RETURNED AT 1:30 P.M. WITH THE REPLACEMENT MONEY ORDER. CAUSE CALLED AT 2:10 P.M. NO APPEARANCES MADE. COURT RECESSED AFTER AFTERNOON SESSION CONCLUDED AT APPROXIMATELY 3:45 P.M. RULING: APPLICATION IS DENIED. THE COURT EXPRESSES ITS APPRECIATION TO THE DEFENDANT AND HIS MOTHER FOR THEIR COURTESY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • MOTION FILED: EX PARTE MOTION HEARING SET FOR 4/05/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED CAUSE IS CALLED FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO 1)LIFT TEMPORARY STAY, 2)ORDER WRIT OF POSSESSION, 3)AWARD ADDITIONAL COSTS AND DAMAGES . PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION IS GRANTED. . STAY ON EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT IS VACATED. . WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. . PLAINTIFF IS AWARDED COSTS IN THE SUM OF $85.00. . COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED CAUSE IS CALLED FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO 1)LIFT TEMPORARY STAY, 2)ORDER WRIT OF POSSESSION, 3)AWARD ADDITIONAL COSTS AND DAMAGES . PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION IS GRANTED. . STAY ON EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT IS VACATED. . WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. . PLAINTIFF IS AWARDED COSTS IN THE SUM OF $85.00. . COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • CHANG, SAM K. VS. PATTERSON, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2013
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED- 1 HR(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • FAULTY PROOF OF SERVICE FILED FOR ROBERT PATTERSON. ADDRESS OF FAULTY PROOF OF SERVICE FILED FOR ROBERT PATTERSON. ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF OF RECORD DOES NOT MATCH OUR FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.