This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 23:16:39 (UTC).

CHANDRA COLLINS, ET AL. VS DOE 1, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 CHANDRA COLLINS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5415

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLLINS CHANDRA

COLLINS OVON

COLLINS LASHANTI

Defendants

2 DOE

1 DOE

3 DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMON DAWN T

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/6/2018: Complaint

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Guardian Ad Litem

4/25/2018: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/6/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chandra Collins (Plaintiff); Lashanti Collins (Plaintiff); Ovon Collins (Plaintiff); As to: Doe 1 (Defendant); Doe 2 (Defendant); Doe 3 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chandra Collins (Plaintiff); Lashanti Collins (Plaintiff); Ovon Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON DAWN T.