This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 17:59:19 (UTC).

CHAMPION DODGE VS AARON ALEXANDER DAVIS

Case Summary

On 01/18/2017 CHAMPION DODGE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AARON ALEXANDER DAVIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0531

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAMPION DODGE

Defendant

DAVIS AARON ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/18/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/22/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 04/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/5/2017: Minute Order of 04/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/5/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/5/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

(Sacramento)

9/18/2017: (Sacramento)

Unknown

12/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/8/2018: Unknown

(Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

1/29/2018: (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

(Ruling on Submitted Matter)

1/29/2018: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Order Determining Claim Of Exemption (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/29/2018

1/29/2018: Order Determining Claim Of Exemption (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/29/2018

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Order Determining Claim Of Exemption (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/29/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Updated -- Claim of Exemption: Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Champion Dodge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 01/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 01/29/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Claim of Exemption; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim; Filed by: Champion Dodge (Plaintiff); As to: Aaron Alexander Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 01/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption; Filed by: Champion Dodge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 04/05/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Champion Dodge against Defendant Aaron Alexander Davis on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Champion Dodge on 01/18/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $2,595.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Champion Dodge (Plaintiff); As to: Aaron Alexander Davis (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Champion Dodge (Plaintiff); As to: Aaron Alexander Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0009755 (Check); Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0009755 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less