This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 17:28:58 (UTC).

CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC VS KUNAL NISCHAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KUNAL NISCHAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0716

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS LLC

Defendant

NISCHAL KUNAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE

 

Court Documents

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

2/14/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

2/11/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/11/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (KUNAL NISCHAL)

1/23/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (KUNAL NISCHAL)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/23/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/21/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/21/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/21/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KUNAL NISCHAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC against Defendant KUNAL NISCHAL on the Complaint filed by CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC on 01/21/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1733 N. Cherokee Avenue, Apt. 17, Los Angeles, CA 90028 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 48.82

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KUNAL NISCHAL (Defendant); Service Date: 01/26/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 01/26/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KUNAL NISCHAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to KUNAL NISCHAL; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC on 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; KUNAL NISCHAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KUNAL NISCHAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KUNAL NISCHAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KUNAL NISCHAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAMPION CHEROKEE VILLAS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY